+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3495.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 11).
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1271.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1178.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 885.) (April 26).
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 15, 2017: Unfinished Business SB171 Hernandez et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 15, 2017: SB 171 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD
- Yeas: 79
July 11, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB171 Hernandez et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
May 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor