+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (36)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died on the inactive file.
- From Assembly without further action.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
- Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended.
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 11).
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 29 set for second hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 20).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 775.) (April 13).
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 588.) (March 23).
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 23.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (6)
June 30, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB17 Pan et al.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 23, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor