+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 836, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 84. Page 2784.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3176.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- June 4 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1003.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 797.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 10, 2019: Unfinished Business SB17 Umberg Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 9, 2019: SB 17 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Gabriel
- Yeas: 79
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
June 18, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
May 9, 2019: Consent Calendar SB17
- Yeas: 38
April 23, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor