+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On October 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2924.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 3260.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 851.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 782.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 14, 2017: Unfinished Business SB169 Jackson et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
September 13, 2017: SB 169 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
July 11, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
June 27, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB169 Jackson et al.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1