+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 262, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2574.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2962.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2809.)
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- (Corrected May 14).
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 291.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
September 9, 2021: SB 169 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB169 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB169
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor