+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 23.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 390.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
- Read first time.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 2, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor