+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (36)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Veto sustained.
- Stricken from file.
On October 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2830.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 3198.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 30).
On August 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 1221.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1091.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 775.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 576.) (April 3).
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
- April 10 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2019: Unfinished Business SB163 Portantino et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 9, 2019: SB 163 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Nazarian
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
June 25, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 4
May 22, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB163 Portantino
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
May 6, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
April 3, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor