+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 25 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E. & C.A.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor