+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3331.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1091.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- March 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2019: Unfinished Business SB160 Jackson et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 10, 2019: SB 160 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Limón
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
July 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2019: Special Consent SB160
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
April 22, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor