+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Beall.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1145.) (May 28).
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 26 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 26.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 919.) (May 6).
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 824.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 26, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 6, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
April 28, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor