+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2529.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2967.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On June 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 742.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 367.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 19.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 3, 2019: SB 151 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Berman
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 14, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
June 19, 2019: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB151 Umberg
- Yeas: 38
March 19, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor