+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 931, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5683.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6313.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4812.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 24, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1509 GOV. & F. (McGuire) Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2018: SB 1509 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 8, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 27, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 10, 2018: Consent Calendar SB1509 GOV. & F.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Governance and Finance
Type:
Primary Sponsor