+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 903, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6113.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6070.)
- Set for hearing August 30.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5927.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6710.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4790.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 14.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1504 P.E. & R. (Pan) Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2018: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 5
August 28, 2018: SB 1504 P.E. & R. Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ
- Yeas: 80
August 8, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 20, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 10, 2018: Consent Calendar SB1504 P.E. & R.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Public Employment and Retirement
Type:
Primary Sponsor