+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 6189.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 7128.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 28).
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and JUD.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4419.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4312.) (May 25).
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- May 14 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 14.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 7 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4820.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 4699.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 31, 2018: SB 1487 Stern Senate Third Reading By KALRA
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 5
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1487 Stern Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
August 16, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
June 28, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
June 26, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1487 Stern
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 22, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 16, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor