+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3917.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3798.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3540.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1480 Glazer et al.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 9, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor