+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 537.) (March 29).
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 29, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor