+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4457.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4311.) (May 25).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4817.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 11 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 27, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2018: Special Consent SB1470
- Yeas: 39
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor