+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 760, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2658.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2790.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On July 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 7 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1197.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1148.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 15).
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Set for hearing April 15.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2015: Unfinished Business SB147 Hernandez Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
September 2, 2015: SB 147 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD
- Yeas: 80
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB147 Hernandez
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 4, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor