+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Ordered to unfinished business.
- From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Grove.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5303.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 562.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 441.) (March 26).
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 31, 2020: Unfinished Business SB146 Beall Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2020: SB 146 Beall Senate Third Reading By Mullin
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 11, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
April 4, 2019: Consent Calendar SB146
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor