+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1790.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2178.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23).
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- June 16 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 533.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 506.) (April 6).
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 6, 2015: Special Consent #4 SB146 Galgiani Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2015: SB 146 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 29, 2015: SB 146 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 23, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
April 9, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd SB146 Galgiani Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2015: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor