+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 857, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 7085.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6145.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 6198.)
- Urgency clause adopted.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 6174.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (August 29).
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 8).
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4941.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4696.) (April 17).
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2018: SB 1459 Cannella Third Reading Urgency By WOOD
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
August 31, 2018: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1459 Cannella et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
August 8, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
June 27, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 3, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1459 Cannella et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
April 17, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1