+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4622.) (April 11).
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
April 11, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6