+ − Summaries (14)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (45)
On October 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 712, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3181.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 11).
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 2787.)
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2780.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 9).
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly rule 77.2.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2690.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
On July 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 1100.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 817.) (April 28).
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 757.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (18)
September 11, 2015: SB 145 Pan Senate Third Reading By BONTA
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 4) SB145 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 14
September 11, 2015: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 4) SB145 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 14
September 9, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
September 9, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
August 31, 2015: SB 145 Pan Senate Third Reading By BONTA Amend By BONTA Set #1
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
August 31, 2015: SB 145 Pan Senate Third Reading By BONTA Amend By BONTA Set #1
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
August 26, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
June 23, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
June 23, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB145 Pan
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 3
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor