+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 666, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 6129.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6975.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 4355.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4311.) (May 25).
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1447 Hernandez et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
August 30, 2018: SB 1447 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By BONTA
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
June 26, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
May 29, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1447 Hernandez et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 22, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 23, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor