+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.