+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on unfinished business, reconsideration pending.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Mullin.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 29. Noes 33. Page 6379.)
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5971.)
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (August 10).
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 4099.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4011.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3644.) (April 20).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3393.) (April 5).
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2016: SB 1441 Leno Senate Third Reading By MULLIN
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 18
August 19, 2016: SB 1441 Leno Senate Third Reading By TRANS. Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
June 29, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
June 1, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1441 Leno
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 16, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 20, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 5, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor