+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 259, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4404.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5917.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3493.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3297.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1434 Wolk Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 7, 2014: SB 1434 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
July 2, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 17, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
May 19, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1434 Wolk
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
April 29, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor