+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 596, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5491.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6239.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5972.)
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 4058.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4010.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3419.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 29, 2016: Unfinished Business SB1425 Pavley Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
August 24, 2016: SB 1425 Pavley Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 5
August 19, 2016: SB 1425 Pavley Senate Third Reading By A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
June 27, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 31, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1425 Pavley
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
May 27, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 2, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 6, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor