+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor