+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4606.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6128.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6026.)
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3612.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3716.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3296.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 19, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1420 Wolk Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 18, 2014: SB 1420 Wolk Senate Third Reading By WEBER
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 6, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 17, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
May 27, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1420 Wolk
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor