+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor