+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 987, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6128.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 6964.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4465.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4820.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and PUB. S.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1412 Bradford Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2018: SB 1412 Bradford Senate Third Reading By THURMOND
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 4
August 8, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
June 27, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 31, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1412 Bradford
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 11, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor