+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 5.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3216.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor