+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6186.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3936.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3795.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3438.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (8)
August 24, 2022: SB 1406 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Stone
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
June 28, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 22, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 25, 2022: Special Consent SB1406
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 2, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
April 4, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor