+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5548.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3360.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 29).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 16, 2014: SB 1406 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
May 5, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1406 Wolk
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor