+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 892, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5141.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5780.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On June 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21).
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4056.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4010.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3611.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 18, 2016: Special Consent SB1406 Mendoza
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
August 11, 2016: SB 1406 Mendoza Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 3, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
June 21, 2016: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
May 31, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1406 Mendoza
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 16, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor