+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5964.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3591.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3340.) (April 30).
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 11, 2014: SB 1400 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BONTA
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
May 27, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1400 Hancock
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
April 30, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor