+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- August 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 19.
On July 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on T. & I.D.
- To print.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor