+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 19).
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4463.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4309.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 14.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4786.) (April 24).
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 19, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
May 31, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1396 Galgiani
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 14, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor