+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 13, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor