+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1012, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 6034.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 23. Page 6924.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 4391.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4309.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4516.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2018: Unfinished Business SB1391 Lara et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
August 29, 2018: SB 1391 Lara Senate Third Reading By CHIU
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 16
June 26, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 30, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB1391 Lara et al.
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 23, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 3, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1