+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4684.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6121.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3592.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 5.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3218.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 21, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1388 Lieu
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
August 18, 2014: SB 1388 Lieu Senate Third Reading By COOLEY
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 27, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1388 Lieu
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
April 22, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7