+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 310, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5283.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
On August 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- July 29 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3843.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 9.
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3596.) (May 26).
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 26.
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2020: SB 1380 Allen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 30, 2020: Unfinished Business SB1380 Allen Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 18, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
August 6, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB1380
- Yeas: 40
May 26, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor