+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 441, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4911.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6489.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6342.)
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3437.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 5).
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (April 24).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 27, 2014: Unfinished Business SB1380 Wyland Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 26, 2014: SB 1380 Wyland Senate Third Reading By NAZARIAN
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1380 Wyland
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
May 5, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor