+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended.
On August 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On June 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
- (Corrected May 14).
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 281.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
February 22, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB138
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor