+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3218.) Reconsideration granted.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and GOV. & F.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
April 22, 2014: Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor