+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (42)
On September 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 486, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 5532.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5500.)
On August 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 29.
On August 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5448.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 6096.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5965.)
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 11).
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 29).
On June 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5473.)
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4065.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4009.) (May 27).
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 9 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3496.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 12.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
August 30, 2016: Unfinished Business SB1374 Lara Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
August 29, 2016: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 7
August 23, 2016: SB 1374 Lara Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C.
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 3
August 19, 2016: SB 1374 Lara Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
May 31, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB1374 Lara
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 12, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor