+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 17. Page 4953.)
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3667.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 3667.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3715.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3257.) (April 24).
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1372 DeSaulnier
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 4
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB1372 DeSaulnier Reconsider
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor