+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 6185.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 3974.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3794.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3520.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2022: SB 1371 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Ting
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 10
August 11, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
June 21, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 26, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB1371 Bradford
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 9, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor