+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1133.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 25).
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB137 Allen
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 25, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor